TX SB901 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to election integrity; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to election integrity; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |