TX SB901 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to safety standards and practices applicable to the transportation by pipeline of certain substances.
Title
Relating to safety standards and practices applicable to the transportation by pipeline of certain substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-25 - House - SB 901Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - SB 901Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - SB 901Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report withdrawn |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House recommits to conf. comm.-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Corrected Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-23 | House | House recommits to conference committee |
2013-05-22 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-10 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-09 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-09 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-08 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |