TX SB901 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to approval from the Department of State Health Services for disposal of ambulances purchased with certain grant funds.
Title
Relating to approval from the Department of State Health Services for disposal of ambulances purchased with certain grant funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed | |
2011-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AMBULANCES
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF