TX SB9 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school instruction and materials regarding the prevention of child abuse, family violence, dating violence, and sex trafficking and the adoption of public school policies to prevent dating violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school instruction and materials regarding the prevention of child abuse, family violence, dating violence, and sex trafficking and the adoption of public school policies to prevent dating violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#151 (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
2021-09-17 Signed by the Governor
2021-09-03 Sent to the Governor
2021-09-02HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-09-02HouseSigned in the House
2021-09-02SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-09-02SenateReported enrolled
2021-09-02SenateRecord vote
2021-09-02SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-09-02SenateRead
2021-09-02SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-09-02SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-09-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-09-02HouseRecord vote RV#151
2021-09-02HousePassed
2021-09-02HouseRead 3rd time
2021-09-02HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-09-02HouseAmended 3-Schaefer
2021-09-02HouseAmended 2-Shaheen
2021-09-02HouseAmended 1-Dutton
2021-09-02HouseRead 2nd time
2021-09-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-09-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-09-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-09-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-09-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-08-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-08-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-08-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-08-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-08-10SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-10SenateRecord vote
2021-08-10SenatePassed
2021-08-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-10SenateRecord vote
2021-08-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-08-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-08-10SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-07SenateRecord vote
2021-08-07SenateRules suspended
2021-08-07SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-08-07SenateRead first time
2021-08-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-06SenateFiled
2021-08-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB9
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00009I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00009S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00009E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00009H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00009F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SB00009H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SB00009H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SB00009H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00009I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00009I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00009E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00009H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00009H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00009F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00009F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-07-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-10-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB9&RcdVtNo=151&Ch=H&Dt=09/02/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S209-02-F.PDF#page=12

Bill Comments 750

feedback