TX SB9 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on the rate of growth of appropriations for certain categories of spending.
Title
Relating to limitations on the rate of growth of appropriations for certain categories of spending.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SB 9Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-26 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-26 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-26 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2 (Enabling for) 2015-04-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar