TX SB894 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to auditing and verification of information under certain health and human services programs, including the collection of certain payments following an investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to auditing and verification of information under certain health and human services programs, including the collection of certain payments following an investigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2026 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1489 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - RV#1488 (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed as amended
2017-05-21HouseAmended
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseAmended
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-12HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-28SenateRead first time
2017-02-14SenateFiled
2017-02-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB894
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00894I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00894S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00894E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00894H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00894F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-18-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-18-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB894&RcdVtNo=1488&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB894&RcdVtNo=1489&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB894&RcdVtNo=2026&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=55

Bill Comments

feedback