TX SB892 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protection of the rights of conscience for child welfare services providers.
Title
Relating to protection of the rights of conscience for child welfare services providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Family
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Religion
Family
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Religion
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB892 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00892I.htm |