TX SB877 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of certain political subdivisions in certain workers' compensation actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of certain political subdivisions in certain workers' compensation actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1297 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-28SenateRead first time
2017-02-14SenateFiled
2017-02-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback