TX SB860 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exclusion of certain car haulers from the definition of tow truck for purposes of certain laws regulating motor vehicle towing.
Title
Relating to the exclusion of certain car haulers from the definition of tow truck for purposes of certain laws regulating motor vehicle towing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1275 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1275 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1275 |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 1-Goldman |
2021-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3758 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee