TX SB859 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption and a franchise tax credit related to certain research and development activities.
Title
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption and a franchise tax credit related to certain research and development activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB859 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00859I.htm |