TX SB855 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information a municipality may consider in determining the amount of certain building permit and inspection fees.
Title
Relating to information a municipality may consider in determining the amount of certain building permit and inspection fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB852 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Housing
Housing--General
PERMITS
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Housing
Housing--General
PERMITS