TX SB830 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of accounting statements by mortgage servicers for certain loans secured by a lien on residential real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of accounting statements by mortgage servicers for certain loans secured by a lien on residential real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1644 (Y: 96 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Vote reconsidered RV#1596 (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1568 (Y: 66 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-22House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseFailed to pass to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-27SenateRead first time
2017-02-10SenateFiled
2017-02-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB830
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00830I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00830S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00830E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00830H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00830F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB830&RcdVtNo=1568&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB830&RcdVtNo=1596&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB830&RcdVtNo=1644&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=285

Bill Comments

feedback