TX SB83 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


Relating to protection of energy critical infrastructure from electromagnetic, geomagnetic, physical, and cyber-attack threats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to protection of energy critical infrastructure from electromagnetic, geomagnetic, physical, and cyber-attack threats.


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-05-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments