TX SB815 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the funding of port security, facility projects, and port studies.
Title
Relating to the funding of port security, facility projects, and port studies.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2011-03-14 | Rereferred to committee | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-21 | Filed | |
2011-02-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PORT AUTHORITY ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports