TX SB813 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related to frivolous regulatory actions by state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related to frivolous regulatory actions by state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1941 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1479 (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed
2017-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-27SenateRead first time
2017-02-09SenateFiled
2017-02-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB813
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00813I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00813S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00813E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00813H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00813F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB813&RcdVtNo=1479&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB813&RcdVtNo=1941&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=100

Bill Comments

feedback