TX SB812 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited practices for certain health benefit plan issuers and pharmacy benefit managers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited practices for certain health benefit plan issuers and pharmacy benefit managers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-25SenateFiled
2021-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1919 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback