TX SB805 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to Texas women veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Texas women veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenatePassed
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-02SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-02-22SenateRead first time
2017-02-09SenateFiled
2017-02-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback