TX SB8 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to address public safety threats in this state presented by transnational criminal activity, including by establishing a Texas Border Force and making funds available to certain governmental entities.
Title
Relating to measures to address public safety threats in this state presented by transnational criminal activity, including by establishing a Texas Border Force and making funds available to certain governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Filed |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Aliens
BORDER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--General
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Governor
Health
Health--General
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Intergovernmental Relations
MEXICO
Military & Veterans
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RANGERS
Safety
SENATE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Aliens
BORDER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--General
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Governor
Health
Health--General
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Intergovernmental Relations
MEXICO
Military & Veterans
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RANGERS
Safety
SENATE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control