TX SB8 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain prohibited abortions and the treatment and disposition of a human fetus and human fetal tissue; creating a civil cause of action; creating offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain prohibited abortions and the treatment and disposition of a human fetus and human fetal tissue; creating a civil cause of action; creating offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-15SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-15SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenatePassed
2017-03-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-15SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-17SenateFiled
2016-11-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback