TX SB8 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to improving the quality and efficiency of health care.
Title
Relating to improving the quality and efficiency of health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Point of order sustained | |
2011-05-30 | Motion to adopt conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees with instructions | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees w/inst-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees with instructions | |
2011-05-27 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-25 | Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-24 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed | |
2011-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH CARE POLICY COUNCIL, TEXAS
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
INSTITUTE OF HEALTH CARE QUALITY & EFFICIENCY, TEXAS
LONG-TERM CARE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH CARE POLICY COUNCIL, TEXAS
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
INSTITUTE OF HEALTH CARE QUALITY & EFFICIENCY, TEXAS
LONG-TERM CARE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF