TX SB793 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a ribbon for certain service members of the military who served in support of operations to secure this state's international border.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a ribbon for certain service members of the military who served in support of operations to secure this state's international border.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1472 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1472
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-04HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2021-04-19HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-14SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-13SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-24SenateFiled
2021-02-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1060 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB793
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00793I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00793S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00793E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00793H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00793F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00793I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00793I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00793H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00793F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB793&RcdVtNo=1472&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback