TX SB790 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation of the women's health advisory committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation of the women's health advisory committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1424 (Y: 83 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Motion to suspend regular order fails (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed
2017-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateMotion to suspend regular order fails
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-22SenateRead first time
2017-02-09SenateFiled
2017-02-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback