TX SB79 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to specialty certification for insurance agents serving certain employer groups.
Title
Relating to specialty certification for insurance agents serving certain employer groups.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents