TX SB779 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the indigent status of a person for the purposes of the driver responsibility program.
Title
Relating to the indigent status of a person for the purposes of the driver responsibility program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road