TX SB779 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to access to certain medical test results in a criminal proceeding; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to access to certain medical test results in a criminal proceeding; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-20HousePosting rule suspended
2015-05-14HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-05-14HouseRead first time
2015-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-05-06SenateReported engrossed
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenatePassed
2015-05-06SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-05-06SenateRecord vote
2015-05-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-02SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-03-02SenateRead first time
2015-02-25SenateFiled
2015-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback