TX SB779 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Insurance
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Insurance
Summary
Relating to expedited credentialing for certain individual health care providers providing services under a managed care plan.
Title
Relating to expedited credentialing for certain individual health care providers providing services under a managed care plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Referred to Insurance | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed | |
2009-02-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |