TX SB77 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1021 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-09HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-09SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-08SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-08SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-13HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2017-04-13HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback