TX SB760 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access and assignment requirements for, support and information regarding, and investigations of certain providers of health care and long-term services.
Title
Relating to access and assignment requirements for, support and information regarding, and investigations of certain providers of health care and long-term services.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - SB 760Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID