TX SB752 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the inheritance tax.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - SB 752Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate discharges conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |