TX SB751 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a criminal offense for fabricating a deceptive video with intent to influence the outcome of an election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a criminal offense for fabricating a deceptive video with intent to influence the outcome of an election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Elections
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-11SenateFiled
2019-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback