TX SB75 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement for parental consent for a minor to join a labor union.
Title
Relating to the requirement for parental consent for a minor to join a labor union.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |