TX SB744 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a tree planting credit to offset tree mitigation fees imposed by a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tree planting credit to offset tree mitigation fees imposed by a municipality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1645 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-23HousePostponed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed
2017-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-05SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-03SenateFiled
2017-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback