TX SB736 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a report on the sale of retail electric power by the General Land Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a report on the sale of retail electric power by the General Land Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed as amended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateAmended
2017-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateAmended
2017-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-03SenateFiled
2017-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB736
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00736I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00736S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00736E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00736H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00736F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB736&RcdVtNo=1814&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments

feedback