TX SB730 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of income-producing tangible personal property having a value of less than a certain amount.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of income-producing tangible personal property having a value of less than a certain amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions