TX SB722 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a fee for participation in the Managed Lands Deer Program of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to a fee for participation in the Managed Lands Deer Program of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing