TX SB72 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to streamlining of and utilization management in Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.
Title
Relating to streamlining of and utilization management in Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-30 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MEDICAID