TX SB713 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sunset review process and certain governmental entities subject to that process.
Title
Relating to the sunset review process and certain governmental entities subject to that process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1774 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1302 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1774 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1302 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 558 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1774 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2014 |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1302 |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Cyrier |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 3-Cyrier |
2021-05-20 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Cyrier |
2021-05-20 | House | Amendment amended 2-Landgraf |
2021-05-20 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Cyrier |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1860 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION, TEXAS STATE
ANATOMICAL BOARD, STATE OF TEXAS
APPRAISER LICENSING & CERTIFICATION BOARD, TEXAS
AUDITOR, STATE
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INJURED EMPLOYEE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LOW-LEVEL RADIOACTIVE WASTE DISPOSAL COMPACT COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
PUBLIC INSURANCE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
TELECONFERENCING
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
VIDEOCONFERENCING
ANATOMICAL BOARD, STATE OF TEXAS
APPRAISER LICENSING & CERTIFICATION BOARD, TEXAS
AUDITOR, STATE
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INJURED EMPLOYEE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LOW-LEVEL RADIOACTIVE WASTE DISPOSAL COMPACT COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
PUBLIC INSURANCE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
TELECONFERENCING
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
VIDEOCONFERENCING