TX SB705 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an exception from disclosure under the public information law for certain personal information of an applicant for an appointment by the governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an exception from disclosure under the public information law for certain personal information of an applicant for an appointment by the governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1553 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-05HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-03-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-29SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenatePassed
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Nominations
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-01SenateFiled
2017-02-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback