TX SB702 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the regulation of the towing and storage of vehicles.
Title
Relating to the regulation of the towing and storage of vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-19 | Amended | |
2009-05-19 | Amended | |
2009-05-19 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time | |
2009-02-06 | Filed | |
2009-02-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1746 (Same As) 2009-03-03 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General