TX SB7 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 97-46)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a one-time supplemental payment of benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a one-time supplemental payment of benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors

Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]
Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Nathan Johnson [D]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Borris Miles [D]
Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]
Sen. Beverly Powell [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]Sen. Drew Springer [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. John Whitmire [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]
Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#98 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Effective immediately
2021-09-09 Signed by the Governor
2021-09-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-09-01HouseSigned in the House
2021-08-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-08-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-30SenateReported enrolled
2021-08-30SenateHouse passage reported
2021-08-30HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseRecord vote RV#98
2021-08-30HousePassed
2021-08-30HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-08-27HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-08-27HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Allen
2021-08-27HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-08-27HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Allen
2021-08-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-08-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-08-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-08-10SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenatePassed
2021-08-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-08-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-08-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-07SenateRecord vote
2021-08-07SenateRules suspended
2021-08-07SenateReferred to Finance
2021-08-07SenateRead first time
2021-08-06SenateFiled
2021-08-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB8 (Same As) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Appropriations
HB206 (Similar To) 2021-08-27 - Referred to Appropriations

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB7
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00007I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00007S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00007E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00007H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00007F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SB00007H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00007I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00007I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00007E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00007H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-07-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-09-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=98&Ch=H&Dt=08/30/2021

Bill Comments

feedback