TX SB7 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-13 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-13 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a one-time supplemental payment of benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to a one-time supplemental payment of benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Amended |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB85 (Similar To) 2021-07-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB85 (Similar To) 2021-07-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB207 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Filed
HB190 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Filed
HB85 (Similar To) 2021-07-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB207 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Filed
HB190 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Filed