TX SB7 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 64-14)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to improper relationships between educators and students and reporting of educator misconduct; creating a criminal offense and expanding the applicability of an existing offense; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors

Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Konni Burton [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Craig Estes [R]Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D]
Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Donald Huffines [R]
Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]
Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Borris Miles [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R]Sen. Carlos Uresti [D]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]
Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. John Whitmire [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1103 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-15SenateRead
2017-05-15SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-10SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-08SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenatePassed
2017-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenateAmended
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-03-08SenatePostponed
2017-03-08SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenateAmended
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenateAmended
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenateAmended
2017-03-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-08SenateRules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Education
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-17SenateCo-author authorized
2016-11-18SenateFiled
2016-11-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB7
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00007I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00007S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00007E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00007H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-08-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-08-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-08-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1103&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments

feedback