TX SB7 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the computation of and to decreasing the rates of the franchise tax.
Title
Relating to the computation of and to decreasing the rates of the franchise tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Motion to table fails |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |