TX SB7 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to strategies for and improvements in quality of health care provided through and care management in the child health plan and medical assistance programs designed to achieve healthy outcomes and efficiency.
Title
Relating to strategies for and improvements in quality of health care provided through and care management in the child health plan and medical assistance programs designed to achieve healthy outcomes and efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed | |
2011-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CHILD HEALTH PLAN
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
HOME HEALTH CARE
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICAID & CHIP QUALITY-BASED PAYMENT ADVISORY COMMITTEE
CHILD HEALTH PLAN
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
HOME HEALTH CARE
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICAID & CHIP QUALITY-BASED PAYMENT ADVISORY COMMITTEE