TX SB699 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Real Estate Commission and the regulation of certain real estate professionals.
Title
Relating to the Texas Real Estate Commission and the regulation of certain real estate professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - SB 699Third Reading House (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Elkins (Y: 32 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-05-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Elkins (Y: 32 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
REAL ESTATE AGENTS
REAL ESTATE BROKERS
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
REAL ESTATE AGENTS
REAL ESTATE BROKERS
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION