TX SB695 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding for The University of Texas at Tyler's school of pharmacy.
Title
Relating to funding for The University of Texas at Tyler's school of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. Mark Dorazio [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1794 (Similar To) 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
HB1794 (Similar To) 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
HB1794 (Similar To) 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Tuition
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT TYLER
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Tuition
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT TYLER