TX SB693 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to three-point seat belts on buses that transport schoolchildren.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1362 (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Record vote RV#1344 (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1343 (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1342 (Y: 74 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1341 (Y: 68 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-31SenateFiled
2017-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00693I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00693S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00693E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00693H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00693F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693&RcdVtNo=1341&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693&RcdVtNo=1342&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693&RcdVtNo=1343&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693&RcdVtNo=1344&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB693&RcdVtNo=1362&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-26-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments

feedback