TX SB693 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to permit application and amendment hearings conducted by groundwater conservation districts and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Title
Relating to permit application and amendment hearings conducted by groundwater conservation districts and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-29 | House passage reported | |
2011-04-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-28 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-31 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed | |
2011-02-14 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure