TX SB69 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-16)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocations of money for transfer to the state highway fund and the economic stabilization fund and the investment of money in the economic stabilization fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocations of money for transfer to the state highway fund and the economic stabilization fund and the investment of money in the economic stabilization fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1532 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1532
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 2-Zerwas
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Capriglione
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SJR1 (Enabling for) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Finance

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback