TX SB681 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a pilot program for a three-year high school diploma plan and cost-neutral expansion of full-day prekindergarten programs.
Title
Relating to a pilot program for a three-year high school diploma plan and cost-neutral expansion of full-day prekindergarten programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN